Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Hermann, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Volta Inferiore, Ghana

Titular Bishop of Bubastis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1879Born
20 Jul 190222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
26 Mar 192343.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Volta Inferiore, Ghana
26 Mar 192343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
13 Jul 192343.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bubastis
8 Apr 194565.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Volta Inferiore, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Augustin Hermann
Bishop Augustin Hermann S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Volta Inferiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurckheim, France

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast