Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Brunhes

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1874BornSaint-Flour
8 Jul 190025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Flour, France
20 May 193257.7AppointedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
20 Aug 193258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
24 Feb 194974.5DiedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Brunhes:
Bishop Gabriel Brunhes (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013