Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Hauger, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}

Titular Bishop of Clazomenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1873BornKingersheim, France
5 Jul 189622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
13 Feb 192551.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana
16 Feb 192551.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
24 May 192551.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
14 Nov 193259.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana
12 Oct 194875.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Ernest Hauger:
Bishop Ernest Hauger S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013