Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jacques Assanvo Ahiwa

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1969 Born
13 Dec 199728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire
5 May 202051.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
5 May 202051.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania
3 Oct 202051.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Jacques Assanvo Ahiwa (VIAF: 313414417)
Father Jacques Assanvo Ahiwa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Bouaké

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuindjabo, District of Aboisso, Archdiocese of Abidjan
Ordained BishopSainte-Thérèse de l'enfant Jésus, Cathedral, Bouaké, Archdiocese of Bouaké

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Bouaké.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 7 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jul 2020

Quantcast