Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Ahoua, F.D.P.

Bishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1960 Born
6 Jan 199029.6Perpetual VowsMember of Sons of Divine Providence
14 Jul 199030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
27 Mar 201049.9AppointedBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire
4 Jul 201050.1Ordained BishopBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Raymond Ahoua
Bishop Raymond Ahoua F.D.P. (born ) Bishop of Grand-Bassam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonoua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand-Bassam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,754

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018