Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Spiteri

Apostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Archbishop of Serta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1959 BornSliema, Malta
29 Jun 198425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
21 Feb 200949.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serta
21 Feb 200949.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka
24 May 200950.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serta
1 Oct 201354.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Joseph Spiteri:
Archbishop Joseph Spiteri (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Côte d’Ivoire

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Côte d’Ivoire.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,177
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Oct 2013