Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Cremona, O.P.

Archbishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1946 BornValletta
29 Sep 196721.7Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Mar 196923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Dec 200660.9AppointedArchbishop of Malta
26 Jan 200761.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Paul Cremona:
Archbishop Paul Cremona O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Malta

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Malta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Oct 2013