Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero (Stanley) Cardinal Grech, O.S.A.

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1925 Born
8 Oct 194418.7ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
25 Mar 195024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
18 Jan 201286.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of San Leone
8 Feb 201286.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of San Leone
18 Feb 201286.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti
18 Feb 201286.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 201286.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti

MicroData Summary for Prospero (Stanley) Grech
Prospero (Stanley) Cardinal Grech O.S.A. (born ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVittoriosa (Birgu), Malta

Please contact the Cardinal through the Cardinal Titular Church of Santa Maria Goretti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 2s21: CB, 21 Jan 2012
  • c234: CB, 8 Feb 2012
  • 1m43: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast