Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Versaldi

President of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Cardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Gesł a Castro Pretorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1943 BornVillarboit (Vercelli)
29 Jun 196723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vercelli, Italy
4 Apr 200763.6AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
26 May 200763.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
10 Jun 200763.8InstalledBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
21 Sep 201168.1AppointedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
21 Sep 201168.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
18 Feb 201268.5Elevated to CardinalPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
18 Feb 201268.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Gesł a Castro Pretorio
15 Jun 201268.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Gesł a Castro Pretorio
28 Feb 201369.5CeasedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
16 Mar 201369.6ConfirmedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Versaldi:
Giuseppe Cardinal Versaldi (born ) President of Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Please contact the Cardinal through the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,425
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2011
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1c04: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2012
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015