Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Gallese

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1962 Born
23 Apr 198826.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
29 Sep 199028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
20 Oct 201250.5AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
11 Nov 201250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
25 Nov 201250.6InstalledBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Gallese
Bishop Guido Gallese (born ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained DeaconSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
Ordained PriestSanti Pietro e Teresa del Bambino Gesł, Church, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 20 Oct 2012
  • od/c01: CB, 20 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,603
  • loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast