Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ernesto Palletti

Bishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1956 Born
29 Jun 198326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
18 Dec 200448.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
18 Dec 200448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fundi
16 Jan 200548.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fundi
20 Oct 201255.9AppointedBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ernesto Palletti
Bishop Luigi Ernesto Palletti (born ) Bishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,808
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast