Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Gonzi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1885BornVittoriosa
19 Dec 190823.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 192439.1AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
20 Jul 192439.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta
10 Aug 192439.2InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
14 Oct 194358.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malta
14 Oct 194358.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
17 Dec 194358.6SucceededBishop of Malta
1 Jan 194458.6AppointedArchbishop of Malta
29 Nov 197691.5RetiredArchbishop of Malta
22 Jan 198498.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Malta

MicroData Summary for Michele Gonzi:
Archbishop Michele Gonzi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 75.1 years
  • a bishop for 59.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1924, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014