Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Tigga, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Raiganj


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1916BornPaikpara
21 Nov 194832.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Aug 196246.5AppointedBishop of Dumka, India
7 Oct 196246.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dumka, India
8 Jun 197862.3AppointedBishop of Raiganj, India
29 Jan 198669.9DiedBishop of Raiganj, India

MicroData Summary for Leo Tigga:
Bishop Leo Tigga S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Raiganj

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015