Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dumka

Dioecesis Dumkaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julius Marandi, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 8 August 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ranchi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 14,356 (5,545 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Dudhani, Bhagalpur Rd., Dumka-814101, Dumka Dt., Jharkhand, India
  • Telephone: (06434)222.413
  • Fax: 223.377

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Malda
17 January 1952ErectedArchdiocese of Calcutta Prefecture Apostolic of Malda (erected)
Diocese of Dumka
8 August 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Malda Diocese of Dumka
8 June 1978Territory LostDiocese of Dumka Diocese of Raiganj (erected)
27 June 1998Territory LostDiocese of Dumka Diocese of Purnea (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dumka
197044,2408,965,976.5%153550884467416ap1971
198038,8958,558,304.5%1236488106711715ap1981
199057,6919,740,000.6%27517873912020822ap1991
199977,5422,273,3523.4%3145761,0208712115ap2000
200079,2002,273,3523.5%3253859318816515ap2001
200186,9203,383,7712.6%3359929449813119ap2002
200287,8903,383,7712.6%34619592511615725ap2003
200391,5473,383,7712.7%356910488010714725ap2004
200494,5373,383,7712.8%36639995410815229ap2005
2006100,6423,383,7713.0%386810694910923626ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 5 Mar 2012