Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eric Benjamin

Deceased

Bishop of Darjeeling


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1920BornKurseong
24 Aug 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 196242.2AppointedBishop of Darjeeling, India
7 Oct 196242.4Ordained BishopBishop of Darjeeling, India
12 May 199474.0DiedBishop of Darjeeling, India

MicroData Summary for Eric Benjamin:
Bishop Eric Benjamin (born , died ) Bishop of Darjeeling

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013