Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus Flavian D’Souza, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Raiganj, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1939Born
20 Jun 195717.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
13 Jul 197132.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Jan 198747.5AppointedBishop of Raiganj, India
17 May 198747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Raiganj, India
30 Apr 201676.8DiedBishop of Raiganj, India

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Flavian D’Souza (VIAF: 43948380)
Bishop Alphonsus Flavian D’Souza S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Raiganj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,710
  • d: CB, 30 Apr 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017