Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas D’Souza

Archbishop of Calcutta, India

Apostolic Administrator of Krishnagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1950 Born
16 Apr 197726.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 199746.8AppointedBishop of Bagdogra, India
25 Jan 199847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bagdogra, India
12 Mar 201160.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Calcutta, India
23 Feb 201261.4SucceededArchbishop of Calcutta, India
17 Apr 201968.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Krishnagar, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas D’Souza
Archbishop Thomas D’Souza (born ) Archbishop of Calcutta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdyapady
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Good Shepherd, Church, Bagdogra, Diocese of Bagdogra

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Calcutta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,229
  • s: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Sep 2019

Quantcast