Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Sebastian D’Souza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1926BornIgatpuri
24 Aug 194822.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 197448.0AppointedBishop of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
5 May 197448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
29 Mar 198559.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Calcutta, India
5 Apr 198660.2SucceededArchbishop of Calcutta, India
2 Apr 200276.2RetiredArchbishop of Calcutta, India
27 Jun 201690.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Calcutta, India

MicroData Summary for Henry Sebastian D’Souza
Archbishop Henry Sebastian D’Souza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jun 2016