Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Bilung, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Rourkela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1933 BornKusumdegi
3 Oct 196128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
4 Jul 197946.1AppointedBishop of Rourkela, India
3 Nov 197946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rourkela, India
2 Apr 200975.8RetiredBishop of Rourkela, India

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Bilung:
Bishop Alphonse Bilung S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rourkela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rourkela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013