Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Das

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Berhampur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1930BornDantolinigi
6 Dec 195929.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 199362.8AppointedBishop of Berhampur, India
7 Jul 199363.0Ordained BishopBishop of Berhampur, India
27 Nov 200676.4RetiredBishop of Berhampur, India
5 Aug 200878.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Berhampur, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Das:
Bishop Joseph Das (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Berhampur

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2006
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,119
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013