Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Thiruthalil, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Balasore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1936 BornVazhakulam
14 Apr 196327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
24 Jan 197438.0AppointedBishop of Berhampur, India
5 May 197438.3Ordained BishopBishop of Berhampur, India
18 Dec 198953.9AppointedBishop of Balasore, India
9 Dec 201377.9RetiredBishop of Balasore, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Thiruthalil:
Bishop Thomas Thiruthalil C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Balasore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Balasore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014