Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Westermann, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sambalpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1905BornWerne, Germany
22 May 193227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Mar 194842.9AppointedPrefect of Indore, India
14 Jun 195146.1AppointedBishop of Sambalpur, India
29 Jul 195146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sambalpur, India
28 Feb 197468.8ResignedBishop of Sambalpur, India
23 Oct 198580.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sambalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Hermann Westermann:
Bishop Hermann Westermann S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sambalpur

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1951, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 9 Dec 2013