Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Shyamal Bose

Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Baruipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1961 Born
5 May 199130.1Ordained PriestPriest of Baruipur, India
17 May 201958.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baruipur, India
24 Jun 201958.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Baruipur, India

MicroData Summary for Shyamal Bose
Father Shyamal Bose (born ) Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Baruipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGosaba, Archdiocese of Calcutta
Ordained BishopGrounds, Holy Cross School, Baruipur, Diocese of Baruipur

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Baruipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 27 May 2019
  • c2+: CB, 28 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 30 May 2019

Quantcast