Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Redento Maria Gauci, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibamba, Peru

Titular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1920Born
1 Aug 194322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
5 Jun 196241.4AppointedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
8 Apr 196746.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania
30 Apr 196746.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania
Feb 197756.0ResignedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
10 Feb 197857.1DiedPrelate Emeritus of Chuquibamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Redento Maria Gauci
Bishop Redento Maria Gauci O. Carm. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valletta, Malta

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast