Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Xavier, C.O. †

Deceased

Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

Titular See: (died before appointment)


Events

DateEventTitle
31 May 1806Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Jan 1834DiedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Dec 1834AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ceylon, Sri Lanka
3 Dec 1834AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier:
Priest Francisco Xavier C.O. (died ) Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

  • a priest for 27.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013