Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilarion Sillani (Silani), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1812Born
22 Sep 186351.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
22 Sep 186351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
27 Dec 186351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
27 Mar 187967.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Hilarion Sillani (Silani)
Bishop Hilarion Sillani (Silani) O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto di Civitanova, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Ordained BishopKottar, Diocese of Quilon, India
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017