Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Valerga, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Myriophytos

Vicar Apostolic of Quilon

Titular See: (Carlo Giacinto di Sant'Elia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1818Born
28 Oct 183416.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
31 May 185435.8AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Quilon, India
24 May 185940.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quilon, India
24 May 185940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
5 Jun 185940.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
24 Dec 186446.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Valerga
Bishop Emanuele Valerga O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Myriophytos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeriale, Diocese of Albenga, Italy
Ordained BishopSte Marie de la Victoire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017