Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Marie-Joseph Jeancard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1799Born
20 Dec 182324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fréjus, France
Jul 1826²26.5ProfessedPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jul 183434.6IncardinatedPriest of Marseille, France
18 Mar 185858.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
18 Mar 185858.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
28 Oct 185858.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
21 May 186161.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
6 Jul 187575.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie-Joseph Jeancard (VIAF: 88948418)
Bishop Jacques-Marie-Joseph Jeancard (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCannes
Ordained BishopMarseille, Diocese of Marseille
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017