Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Antoine-Henri Jordany

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1798Born
16 Jun 182122.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 185557.1SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
20 Dec 185557.2ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
25 Feb 185657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
4 Apr 187677.5RetiredBishop of Fréjus, France
25 Oct 188789.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Antoine-Henri Jordany
Bishop Joseph-Antoine-Henri Jordany (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuimoisson
Ordained BishopSt. Sulpice, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017