Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Alexandre de Richery

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1759BornAllons
19 Feb 178525.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 182363.6SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
16 May 182363.7ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
20 Jul 182363.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
1 Oct 182364.1InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
3 Jun 182969.8SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
27 Jul 182969.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
12 Sep 182970.1InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
15 Nov 183071.2DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Alexandre de Richery
Archbishop Charles-Alexandre de Richery (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016