Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles-Jean-Baptiste Michel

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1761BornAix-en-Provence
24 Sep 178524.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 182967.8SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
27 Jul 182968.0ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
21 Sep 182968.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
22 Feb 184583.6DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles-Jean-Baptiste Michel:
Bishop Louis-Charles-Jean-Baptiste Michel (born , died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013