Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jérôme-Marie Champion de Cicé

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1735BornRennes
24 Jun 177034.8SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
6 Aug 177034.9ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
26 Aug 177035.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
8 Aug 177135.9InstalledBishop of Rodez, France
28 Jan 178145.4SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
2 Apr 178145.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
8 Oct 180166.1ResignedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
9 Apr 180266.6SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
10 Apr 180266.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
14 Jul 180266.9InstalledArchbishop of Aix, France
22 Aug 181075.0DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Jérôme-Marie Champion de Cicé:
Archbishop Jérôme-Marie Champion de Cicé (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013