Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Chrysostome de Villaret

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1739BornRodez, France
30 Apr 180263.2SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
15 May 180263.3ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
23 May 180263.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
11 Jul 180263.4InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
17 Dec 180465.8SelectedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
1 Feb 180566.0ConfirmedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
23 Dec 180566.9AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
3 Oct 181475.6RetiredBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
9 May 182485.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jean-Chrysostome de Villaret:
Bishop Jean-Chrysostome de Villaret (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Casale Monferrato

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66, and Page 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015