Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Jean-Philippe Dubourg

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1751BornToulouse
177523.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 180250.7SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
1 Jun 180250.8ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
17 Jun 180250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
31 Jan 182270.4DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Jean-Philippe Dubourg:
Bishop Marie-Jean-Philippe Dubourg (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013