Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Sébastiani de La Porta

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1745Born
10 Apr 180257.0SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
16 Jun 180257.2ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
24 Jun 180257.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
9 Dec 183186.7DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Sébastiani de La Porta
Bishop Louis Sébastiani de La Porta (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolveroso Plebis Ampuniani

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018