Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Joseph Hirn

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1751Born
10 Jul 180251.3AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
18 Jul 180251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
17 Aug 181968.4DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for François Joseph Hirn
Bishop François Joseph Hirn (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrasbourg

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,802, Number 38
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast