Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Irénée-Yves Desolle (Dessole)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chambéry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1744BornAuch
29 Apr 180257.9SelectedBishop of Digne, France
10 Jul 180258.1ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
11 Jul 180258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
30 Jan 180560.6SelectedBishop of Chambéry, France
22 Mar 180560.8ConfirmedBishop of Chambéry, France
7 Dec 181773.5AppointedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
11 Nov 182379.4RetiredArchbishop of Chambéry, France
31 Dec 182480.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Irénée-Yves Desolle (Dessole):
Archbishop Irénée-Yves Desolle (Dessole) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chambéry

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 147, and Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 27 Jan 2015