Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Eléonor Montanier de Belmont

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1756BornSeyssel
4 Mar 178225.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 180246.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
12 Jul 180246.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Jul 180246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1 May 180852.1DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Eléonor Montanier de Belmont:
Bishop Jean-Eléonor Montanier de Belmont (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015