Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Balthasar Cousin de Grainville

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1745BornLe Havre
12 Jul 180257.3SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
21 Jul 180257.3ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
1 Aug 180257.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
2 Mar 182882.9DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Balthasar Cousin de Grainville:
Bishop Guillaume-Balthasar Cousin de Grainville (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013