Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Mannay

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1745BornChampeix, France
30 Mar 177024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
12 Jul 180256.7SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
17 Jul 180256.7ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
18 Jul 180256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trier, Germany
9 Oct 181670.9ResignedBishop of Trier, Germany
30 Nov 181974.1SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Feb 182074.3ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
5 Dec 182479.1DiedBishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Charles Mannay
Bishop Charles Mannay (born , died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 320, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016