Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Saussol

Deceased

Bishop of Sées


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1759BornDourgne
20 Sep 178324.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181758.5SelectedBishop of Sées, France
1 Oct 181758.6ConfirmedBishop of Sées, France
3 Oct 181960.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées, France
7 Feb 183677.0DiedBishop of Sées, France

MicroData Summary for Alexis Saussol
Bishop Alexis Saussol (born , died ) Bishop of Sées

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016