Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Claude Leblanc de Beaulieu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Arles

Note/Previous Titular See: (Constitutionnel de Seine-Inférieur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1753BornParis
15 Dec 179946.5SelectedBishop
18 Jan 180046.6Ordained BishopBishop
13 Oct 180148.3ResignedBishop
9 Apr 180248.8SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
25 Apr 180248.9ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
8 Aug 181764.1SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
1 Oct 181764.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
25 Aug 181966.2AppointedAdministrator of Soissons, France
14 Sep 182067.2ResignedAdministrator of Soissons, France
6 Oct 182269.3ResignedArchbishop of Arles, France
13 Jul 182572.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Leblanc de Beaulieu:
Archbishop Jean-Claude Leblanc de Beaulieu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arles

  • a bishop for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 87, and Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 26 Jan 2015