Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-Pierre de Grammont

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1685BornBesançon
28 Oct 171732.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 173549.2SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
27 Jun 173549.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
11 Sep 173549.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
7 Sep 175468.8DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Pierre de Grammont:
Archbishop Antoine-Pierre de Grammont (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 4 Jan 2016