Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Nicolas de Montenach

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1709³Born
8 Mar 173223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
22 Nov 175849.7SelectedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
12 Feb 175949.9ConfirmedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
1 Apr 175950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
5 May 178273.1DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Nicolas de Montenach
Bishop Joseph-Nicolas de Montenach (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFribourg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast