Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Friedrich Ambuel

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1704³BornSion
17 Aug 172723.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
29 Sep 172723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
18 Dec 176056.8SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 May 176157.2ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
30 Nov 176157.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
11 Apr 178076.1DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Friedrich Ambuel:
Bishop Franz Joseph Friedrich Ambuel (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1761, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015