Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Le Groing de La Romagère

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1756BornSaint-Sauvier
16 Mar 178225.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181760.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
23 Aug 181962.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
19 Oct 181962.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
19 Feb 184184.2DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Mathias Le Groing de La Romagère
Bishop Mathias Le Groing de La Romagère (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016