Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ludwig Colmar

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1760BornStrasbourg, France
20 Dec 178323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
1 Aug 180242.1SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
7 Aug 180242.1ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
24 Aug 180242.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Dec 181858.5DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ludwig Colmar:
Bishop Joseph Ludwig Colmar (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013