Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Madeleine de La Myre-Mory

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1755BornParis
18 Sep 177924.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181762.1SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
1 Oct 181762.1ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
10 Dec 181964.3SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Feb 182064.5ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
19 Mar 182064.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
25 Aug 182974.0ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
8 Sep 182974.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Claude-Madeleine de La Myre-Mory:
Bishop Claude-Madeleine de La Myre-Mory (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 144, and Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013