Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud-Ferdinand de La Porte

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1756BornVersailles
177619.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 180245.5SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
3 Sep 180245.7ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
5 Sep 180245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
19 Sep 182467.7DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud-Ferdinand de La Porte:
Bishop Arnaud-Ferdinand de La Porte (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013