Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Brault

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1752BornPoitiers
9 Apr 180249.6SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
4 May 180249.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
16 May 180249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
9 Sep 181765.0SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
1 Oct 181765.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
23 Jul 182370.9InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
25 Feb 183380.5DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Charles Brault:
Archbishop Charles Brault (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65, and Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015